This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 08:13:07 (UTC).

ROSAMOND COMMUNITY SERVICES DISTRICT, A CALIFORNIA COMMUNITY SERVICES DISTRICT, ON BEHALF OF ASSESSMENT DISTRICT NO. 1991-3 VS KERN RE PROPERTY PARTNERS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMAPNY

Case Summary

On 08/29/2016 ROSAMOND COMMUNITY SERVICES DISTRICT, A CALIFORNIA COMMUNITY SERVICES DISTRICT, ON BEHALF OF ASSESSMENT DISTRICT NO 1991-3 filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against KERN RE PROPERTY PARTNERS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMAPNY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2024

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROSAMOND COMMUNITY SERVICES DISTRICT, A CALIFORNIA COMMUNITY SERVICES DISTRICT, ON BEHALF OF ASSESSMENT DISTRICT NO. 1991-3

Defendants

KERN RE PROPERTY PARTNERS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMAPNY

RICH ESTATE PROPERTIES, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOSLA, MARTIN

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 02/27/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 06/26/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: KOSLA, MARTIN

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 10/30/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: Cont'd from 06/26/2017

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 12/04/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: KOSLA, MARTIN

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: OSC RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Party: Names: ROSAMOND COMMUNITY SERVICES DISTRICT, A CALIFORNIA COMMUNITY SERVICES DISTRICT, ON BEHALF OF ASSESSMENT DISTRICT NO. 1991-3; RICH ESTATE PROPERTIES, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Comment: ****SEE JUDGMENT FOR DETAILS****

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketJudgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: as to RICH ESTATE PROPERTIES, INC.; signed by David R Lampe

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice - Comment: in Support of Judgment in Judicial Foreclosure; Order of Sale Thereon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketPoints and Authorities - Comment: in Support of Judgment in Judicial Foreclosure; Order of Sale Thereon; Exhibit 1; Declaration of Rondald D Smith in Support Thereof; Exhibit 2; Declaration of Martin Kosla in Support Thereof

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketRequest - Comment: To Fix Attorney Fees and Costs Pursuant to Streets and Highways Code Section 8831 and 8833.5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketRequest for Court Judgment - Comment: as to RICH ESTATE PROPERTIES INC., a California Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: W/O Prejudice as to DOES 2 THROUGH 100, inclusive, ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: Granting request to continue OSC re: Entry of default judgment OSC set for 3/26/18 is continued to 4/26/18. Returned via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference 02/27/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Kern Re Property Partners, LLC. Personal Service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA FIRST LEGAL SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 12/12/16 Hearing Time: 08:30 Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RICH ESTATE PROPERTIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ROSAMOND COMMUNITY SERVICES DISTRICT, A CALIFORNIA COMMUNITY SERVICES DISTRICT, is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOSLA, MARTIN