This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 16:44:47 (UTC).

ROSALES VS PADILLA, ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/10/2015 ROSALES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against PADILLA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0029

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROSALES, LUCINA

Defendants

PADILLA, JESUS

PADILLA, SOPHIA

 

Court Documents

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court)

MO-Unlawful Detainer Court Trial: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff: ROSALES, LUCINA; Defendant: PADILLA, JESUS; Defendant: PADILLA, SOPHIA

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court)

MO - Unlawful Detainer Trial: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Dismissed

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Lack of Prosecution Before Trial; Unlawful Detainer:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • Order - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Comment: CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - MO - Unlawful Detainer Trial: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - MO-Unlawful Detainer Court Trial: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff: ROSALES, LUCINA; Defendant: PADILLA, JESUS; Defendant: PADILLA, SOPHIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: In Compliance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • Notice of Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • Request/Counter Request to Set Case for Trial (UD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: ROSALES, LUCINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less