This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:31:06 (UTC).

RONK VS DOE, ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 RONK filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DOE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0315

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RONK, SAMANTHA

Defendants

DOE, JANE

DOE, JOHN

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Unsatisfied - Comment: Kern County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: RONK, SAMANTHA; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 914 JEFFERSON STREET DELANO, CA 93215 COUNTY OF KERN; Awarded Against: DOE, JOHN; DOE, JANE; Party: Names: RONK, SAMANTHA; DOE, JOHN; DOE, JANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: Kern County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without prejudice, does 1 to 10, inclusive only.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: Unknown Tenant - Anyone Claiming Any Right To Occupancy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: Jane Doe (DE-2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: John Doe (DE-1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: Notice of Order to Appear and Show Cause Why This Matter Should Not be Dismissed mailed to Samantha Ronk (PL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: RONK, SAMANTHA; Served: 10/16/2017; Served: 10/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less