This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:28:21 (UTC).

ROMO VS JACK DAVENPORT SWEEPING SERVICES ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 ROMO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JACK DAVENPORT SWEEPING SERVICES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schuett, Stephen D. and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2353

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schuett, Stephen D.

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROMO, CASSANDRA

Defendants

JACK DAVENPORT SWEEPING SERVICES

MANZANO, JOSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RODRIGUEZ, CONNIE A

Defendant Attorney

BERGSTEN, ROBERT T

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Minute Order 12/3/2018: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 04/09/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: RODRIGUEZ, CONNIE A

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: RE: CERTIFICATE OF PROGRESS RETURNED VIA E-FILE

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/23/2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:10

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed; Comment: T/E 7 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed; Comment: TRJ 04/02/18 JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: why Complaint should not be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to CRC 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: With Prejudice - As to Entire Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Minute Order 12/3/2018: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Unconditional - Comment: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketMinute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference 04/09/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: as to Defendant Jose Manzano, without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketRuling/Certificate of Progress - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Comment: RE: CERTIFICATE OF PROGRESS FILED ON 1/11/17. RULING: EXTENSION GRANTED OSC CONTINUED FROM 1/23/18 TO 2/23/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Progress

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: AS TO JACK DAVENPORT SWEEPING SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: POS OF SUMMONS re JACK DAVENPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 11/22/2017; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/23/2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: CCCS - ROMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: SUMMONS - ROMO RETURNED VIA E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less