This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 18:16:49 (UTC).

ROMAN VS RIVAS

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 ROMAN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RIVAS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Stainfield, Bryan K.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4719

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Stainfield, Bryan K.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ROMAN, ESTEBAN

Defendant

RIVAS, JUANA E

Respondent

RIVAS, JUANA E.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2014
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment - Comment: PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • Judgment of Dissolution (Default) - Comment: STATUS ENDS 03/28/14 JLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • Declaration for Default - Comment: PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • Request to Enter Default - Comment: PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: RETURNED DEFAULT JUDGMENT VIA PRO PER BOX - LETTER SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2013
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure - Comment: RES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2013
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2013
  • Stipulation for Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2013
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure - Comment: RES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2013
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure - Comment: PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2013
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • 805L Pmt: New Suit - Family Law GC 70670(B) (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for ROMAN, ESTEBAN (PE-1). Received from ROMAN, ESTEBAN. Receipt #709374 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • CONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 643

    Read MoreRead Less