This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/14/2023 at 11:41:12 (UTC).

ROLLINS VS GRAY

Case Summary

On 05/04/2022 ROLLINS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GRAY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1787

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROLLINS, ROYCE

Defendant

GRAY, DAVID

 

Court Documents

Unlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet

05/04/2022: Unlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

05/04/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Summons Issued and Filed

05/05/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

05/04/2022: Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

05/05/2022: Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

05/05/2022: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

06/01/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

06/01/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment

06/01/2022: Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment

Judgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

06/08/2022: Judgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

Application for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit

06/08/2022: Application for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit

Electronic Rejection Notice

06/08/2022: Electronic Rejection Notice

Writ of Possession Issued

06/10/2022: Writ of Possession Issued

Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

08/28/2022: Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied; Comment: Issued 06/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Writ of Possession Issued; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ROLLINS, ROYCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: Writ of Possession; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ROLLINS, ROYCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Application for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit; Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ROLLINS, ROYCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Judgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ROLLINS, ROYCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ROLLINS, ROYCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Unknown Tenant-Anyone Claiming Any Rights to Occupancy. Posting.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ROLLINS, ROYCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to David Gray. Personal Service.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ROLLINS, ROYCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Address and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property; Comment: 1015 Pacific Street, Apt# DBakersfield CA 93305County Of KERN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ROLLINS, ROYCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint - Unlawful Detainer; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ROLLINS, ROYCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ROLLINS, ROYCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Unlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ROLLINS, ROYCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less