This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:52:36 (UTC).

ROGERS VS ROGERS

Case Summary

On 10/21/2016 ROGERS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ROGERS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Glennon, Donald P., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0346

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ROGERS, JAMES

Respondent

ROGERS, PAULA ELAINE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2017
  • Notice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • Proof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less