This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/16/2023 at 07:17:19 (UTC).

ROGERS VS MRC GLOBAL (US), INC., A CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 10/06/2022 ROGERS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against MRC GLOBAL US , INC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2637

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROGERS, HARVEY

Defendant

MRC GLOBAL (US), INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARTIN LILIUOKALANI H

Defendant Attorneys

WOODS TIFFANY S

JAMES JOHNNIE A.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/06/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

10/06/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Summons Issued and Filed

10/13/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Order to Show Cause

10/13/2022: Order to Show Cause

Proof of Service of Summons

11/08/2022: Proof of Service of Summons

Answer to Complaint

11/21/2022: Answer to Complaint

Notice of Stay of Proceeding

12/01/2022: Notice of Stay of Proceeding

Notice of Removal of Action (JBSIS)

12/01/2022: Notice of Removal of Action (JBSIS)

Ruling

12/14/2022: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Ruling; Result: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Removal of Action (JBSIS); Filed By: DEFENDANT - MRC GLOBAL (US), INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Stay of Proceeding; Filed By: DEFENDANT - MRC GLOBAL (US), INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Answer to Complaint; Comment: by Defendant MRC GLOBAL (US), INC.; Filed By: DEFENDANT - MRC GLOBAL (US), INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service of Summons; Comment: as to MRC Global (US) INC., a Corporation, Personal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 01/26/2022Hearing Time: 8:30AMHearing Department/Division: J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ROGERS, HARVEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ROGERS, HARVEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ROGERS, HARVEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less