This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/26/2020 at 10:09:17 (UTC).

ROGERS JEWELRY CO., INC. VS MARTIN

Case Summary

On 06/22/2012 ROGERS JEWELRY CO , INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARTIN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4994

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROGERS JEWELRY CO., INC.

Defendant

MARTIN, JEFF

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2016
  • DocketWrit Returned Unsatisfied - Comment: County of Kern

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • DocketImage of Archived Documents - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2012
  • Docket115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for ROGERS JEWELRY CO., INC. (PL-1). Received from ROGERS JEWELRY CO., check no(s) 151191. Receipt #681672 for amount of $25.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2012
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN, ORIGINAL RETURNED VIA ACS BIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2012
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs - Comment: NO COPY REC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 8/22/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: ASHLEY S. AGUILAR FOR ROGERS JEWELRY CO.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • DocketNP1500 - Comment: Department: 14 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. DISPOSED AFTER COURT TRIAL, BEFORE EVIDENCE BY BOTH SIDES (STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY). THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: ASHLEY S. AGUILAR APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR ROGERS JEWELRY CO., INC. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT. *************************************************************************************** PLAINTIFF IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. EVIDENCE PRESENTED BY PLAINTIFF. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF AGAINST DEFENDANT FOR PRINCIPAL $2183.38 COSTS $113.33 PLUS CANCELLATION OF CONTRACT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • Docket4150 Small Claims Trial - Comment: Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: FILING $30.00SERVICE $63.33CLAIM $2183.38default in payments on retail installment account

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Original Type: Small Claims Trial; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Result: CONV; Comment: FILING $30.00SERVICE $63.33CLAIM $2183.38default in payments on retail installment account

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2012
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: UPON JEFF MARTIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2012
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: MARTHA RUBINOL APPEARING ON BEHALF OF ROGERS JEWLERS CO. INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Docket854D Pmt: Small Claims Filing Fee > 12 Claims in 12 Months - Comment: Amount of $100.00 for ROGERS JEWELRY CO., INC. (PL-1). Received from ROGERS JEWELRY CO., check no(s) 149550. Receipt #662443 for amount of $100.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: NO NAME LISTED ON #1 OF THE AUTHORIZATION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: NO NAME ON ITEM #1 OF AUTHORIZATION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 643

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2012
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: ENDORSED COPY IN ACS BIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less