This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 04:44:42 (UTC).

RODRIGUEZ VS RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 RODRIGUEZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Oglesby, John D. and Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0037

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Oglesby, John D.

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RODRIGUEZ, VANESSA

Respondent

RODRIGUEZ, LUIS E

 

Court Documents

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 09/16/2016: Mandatory Settlement Conference 09/16/2016: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Petitioner: RODRIGUEZ, VANESSA; Respondent: RODRIGUEZ, LUIS E

Mandatory Settlement Conference

06/10/16 MO - Mandatory Settlement Conference: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: RODRIGUEZ, VANESSA; Respondent: RODRIGUEZ, LUIS E

Request for Order - Respondent

MO- Request for order- Respondent: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: RODRIGUEZ, VANESSA; Respondent: RODRIGUEZ, LUIS E

Request for Order - Petitioner

MO-Request for Order - Respondent: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: RODRIGUEZ, VANESSA; Respondent: RODRIGUEZ, LUIS E

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Court Trial; Party: Names: RODRIGUEZ, VANESSA; RODRIGUEZ, LUIS E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Mandatory Settlement Conference 09/16/2016: Mandatory Settlement Conference 09/16/2016: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • DocketSettlement Conference Statement - Comment: (Joint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - 06/10/16 MO - Mandatory Settlement Conference: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE COURT DATE: 06/10/2016 TIME: 9:00 AM DIV:A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • DocketAt-Issue Memorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Respondent - MO- Request for order- Respondent: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2015
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 9:45 AM; Result: Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: Re: Child custody, child visitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • DocketResponse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketFamily Law Documents - Requested By: RODRIGUEZ, VANESSA; Served: 09/13/20155:05 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less