Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 18:58:32 (UTC).

RODRIGUEZ VS RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 07/07/2015 RODRIGUEZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Compton, James L., Schuett, Stephen D. and Stainfield, Bryan K.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1592

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Compton, James L.

Schuett, Stephen D.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RODRIGUEZ, SANDY MARIA

Respondent

RODRIGUEZ, JOHNNY FRANK

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Original Type: Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence; DOMESTIC VIOLENCE PETITIONER- PROPERTY RESTRAINT: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: PET DV/TRO PROP RESTRAINT NO SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2016
  • Ex Parte Application and Order to Restore Name - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Comment: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • Mail Returned Undelivered - Comment: JUDGMENT/NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • Child Support Registry Received for Forwarding to SDU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • Mail Returned Undelivered - Comment: DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION/REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • Judgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Compton, James L.; Comment: STATUS ENDS 02/01/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less