This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 09/15/2020 at 04:48:05 (UTC).

RODRIGUEZ VS McDONALD'S RESTAURANT

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 RODRIGUEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against McDONALD'S RESTAURANT. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S. and Hopper, Tina. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0026

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S.

Hopper, Tina

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RODRIGUEZ, JOSE

RODRIGUEZ

Defendants

PACIULLO, MARYANN

McDONALD'S RESTAURANT

MX4, INC.

MARYANN PACIULLO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHTYREV, DMITRI N

Defendant Attorneys

BREMER, KEITH G

VICINO, DANIELLE M.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 09/04/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued from 07/06/2020

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Proofs of Service; 1st Proof, has multiple parties, cannot serve multiple parties on one Proof of Service, 2nd Proof, party served does not conform to the Complaint. Please review.

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 4/20/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:17

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: & final case management conference set con-current. estimate 5 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference 09/04/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued from 07/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without Prejudice, as to McDonald's Restaurant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Case Management Conference 07/06/2020: Judicial Officer: Hopper, Tina; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed; Comment: Continued from 04/20/2020 by Standing Order;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to McDonald's Restaurant via sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Proofs of Service; 1st Proof, has multiple parties, cannot serve multiple parties on one Proof of Service, 2nd Proof, party served does not conform to the Complaint. Please review.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address - Comment: Notice of Change of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Notice OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Mx4 Inc Dba Maryann Paciullos Answer To The Complaint Of Jose Rodriguez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 01/27/20205:40 PM; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 4/20/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less