This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 18:56:09 (UTC).

ROBLES DE DIOS VS GODINEZ MONTES

Case Summary

On 01/25/2017 ROBLES DE DIOS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GODINEZ MONTES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Camacho, Marcos R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0023

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Camacho, Marcos R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ROBLES DE DIOS, FRANCISCO J

Respondent

GODINEZ MONTES, ALEJANDRA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order Before Hearing; Party: Names: ROBLES DE DIOS, FRANCISCO J; GODINEZ MONTES, ALEJANDRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Comment: DISSOLUTION DATE 07/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • DocketFamily Law Documents - Requested By: ROBLES DE DIOS, FRANCISCO J; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service - Comment: VICTORS TYPING SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less