This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/23/2018 at 07:09:42 (UTC).

ROBERT S. COHEN, AN INDIVIDUAL DBA THE COPA GROUP VS MILLIKEN, ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/31/2017 ROBERT S COHEN, AN INDIVIDUAL DBA THE COPA GROUP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MILLIKEN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0071

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERT S. COHEN, AN INDIVIDUAL DBA THE COPA GROUP

Defendants

MILLIKEN, BREANNA

JAMES JORDAN DBA SOCIAL SKILL GAMING

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: ROBERT S. COHEN, AN INDIVIDUAL DBA THE COPA GROUP; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 168040 HIGHWAY 14 #A MOJAVE CA 93501; Awarded Against: MILLIKEN, BREANNA; JAMES JORDAN DBA SOCIAL SKILL GAMING; Party: Names: ROBERT S. COHEN, AN INDIVIDUAL DBA THE COPA GROUP; MILLIKEN, BREANNA; JAMES JORDAN DBA SOCIAL SKILL GAMING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Writ of Possession Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN RETURNED VIA PICK UP-ALL VALLEY COURT SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • Judgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: BREANNA MILLIKEN, JAMES JORDAN DBA SOCIAL SKILL GAMING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT BY CLERK'S JUDGMENT, REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • Proof of Service - Comment: BREANNA MILLIKEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE & REQUEST TO SET TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • Request For Entry of Default Not Entered - Comment: For the Following Reason(s): NO PROOF OF SERVICE FOR BREANNA MILLIKEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: FOR JAMES JORDAN DBA SOCIAL SKILL GAMING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: ROBERT S. COHEN, AN INDIVIDUAL DBA THE COPA GROUP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.