This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:53:39 (UTC).

ROBERT LARRY MOORE DECEASED

Case Summary

On 10/21/2016 ROBERT LARRY MOORE DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Knight, Alisa R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3032

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Knight, Alisa R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MOORE, DANNY LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MCEWAN, MARY JANE

 

Court Documents

Petition for Letters

12/08/16 MO: Petition for Letters: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: ***MATTER SUBMITTED AS "PSP", HOWEVER, A BOND WILL BE SET AT HEARING AND NEED NEW PROPOSED ORDER. APPEARANCE AT HEARING IS REQUIRED*** COMMENT/NOTE - 1. Petitioner is a non-resident; therefore, a minimum bond should be set at $420,000 per PC 8571.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2018
  • Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting - Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Report on waiver of account and petition for final distribution and for allowance of compensation to attorney for ordinary services

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Notice of Hearing - Comment: 3/14/2018 at 9:00 a.m. in Division P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • Compliance Hearing - Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: In Compliance; Comment: re: bond, either a report of status of administrator pursuant to PC 12200 et seq. or petition to close estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Inventory with Property Tax Certificate - Comment: Final: 731,153.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Petition for Final Distribution on Waiver of Accounting - Comment: Report on waiver of account and petition for final distribution and for allowance of compensation to attorney for ordinary services

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Notice to Creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • Letters of Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • Bond Undertaking

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • Order For Probate - Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: ORDER ATTORNEY BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Letters - 12/08/16 MO: Petition for Letters: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: ***MATTER SUBMITTED AS "PSP", HOWEVER, A BOND WILL BE SET AT HEARING AND NEED NEW PROPOSED ORDER. APPEARANCE AT HEARING IS REQUIRED*** COMMENT/NOTE - 1. Petitioner is a non-resident; therefore, a minimum bond should be set at $420,000 per PC 8571.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • Supplement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Supplement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Proof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate - Comment: 12/08/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Confidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of - Comment: Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative - Comment: Duties and Liabilities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Petition for Letters of Administration - Comment: Petition for Letters of Administration Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with Full Authority

    Read MoreRead Less