This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 17:29:15 (UTC).

ROBERSON VS AMS LEGAL SUPPORT SERVICES

Case Summary

On 09/11/2017 ROBERSON filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against AMS LEGAL SUPPORT SERVICES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2107

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERSON, DIANNA

Defendants

AMS LEGAL SUPPORT SERVICES

PRATT, SHAMEKA

ROBERT HAMILTON; PROCESS SERVER

PRATT, SHAMEKKA

HAMILTON, ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

WHITE, KEITH M

LOCKWOOD, CHRISTOPHER D

 

Court Documents

Motion for Fees (Post-Disposition)

Motion for Fees (Post-Disposition) 02/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 1/5/2018 DEFENDANT SHAMEKKA PRATT MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES ResID: 28784; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: LOCKWOOD, CHRISTOPHER D

Ruling

Ruling 12/13/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Ruling

Motion to Strike (ANTI SLAPP) Per CCP 425.16

Motion to Strike (ANTI SLAPP) Per CCP 425.16 12/08/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 11/9/17 Defendants, AMS LEGAL SUPPORT and ROBERT HAMILTON Motion to Strike ResID: 27319; Parties Present Plaintiff: ROBERSON, DIANNA; Defendant; Attorney: LOCKWOOD, CHRISTOPHER D; Defendant; Attorney: WHITE, KEITH M; Defendant; Attorney: WHITE, KEITH M

Motion to Strike

Motion to Strike 12/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: 10/11/17 DEFENDANT SHAMEKKA PRATT MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 425.16 (anti-SLAPP motion) Res ID 27071; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: LOCKWOOD, CHRISTOPHER D; Defendant; Attorney: WHITE, KEITH M; Defendant; Attorney: WHITE, KEITH M

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RETURNED VIA MAIL

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SUMMONS DOES NOT CONFORM TO COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry - Comment: OF ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketOrder Granting Motion - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: SUBMISSION OF PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Fees (Post-Disposition) - Motion for Fees (Post-Disposition) 02/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 1/10/2018 DEFENDANTS AMS LEGAL SUPPORT SERVICES AND ROBERT HAMILTON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS ResID: 28819

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Fees (Post-Disposition) - Motion for Fees (Post-Disposition) 02/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 1/5/2018 DEFENDANT SHAMEKKA PRATT MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES ResID: 28784

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry - Comment: ORDER GRANTING MOTION ENTERED ON 01/26/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Notice of Non Opposition to Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Summary Before Trial (CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO SHAMEKA PRATT, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Unserved; Served: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: AS TO DIANNA ROBERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: AS TO DIANNA ROBERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SUMMONS DOES NOT CONFORM TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date:12/26/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Comment: ***Complaint stricken as to AMS Legal Support Services and Robert Hamilton, Process Server ONLY. Per order of 12/22/17***

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.