This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/22/2021 at 07:42:36 (UTC).

ROBBINS VS HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE COUNTY OF KERN

Case Summary

On 04/27/2021 ROBBINS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE COUNTY OF KERN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0948

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DE LA ROSA, ANGEL

DE LA ROSA, ELIANA

DE LA ROSA, MIA

ROBBINS, BRANDI

Defendant

HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE COUNTY OF KERN. A PUBLIC BODY CORPORATE AND POLITIC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NIELSEN, TANNER R.

Defendant Attorney

DHILLON, SUMMIT S

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 08/12/2021 Hearing Time: 9:15AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: re: Summons: Summons does not conform to the Complaint - Please double check the placement of parties on the Summons

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Proof of Service : The Court House address is incorrect. Item #3.b. needs to have an Authorized Agent for Service listed to accept service. Last, Item #6. is incomplete. Please review.

Demurrer

Demurrer 08/10/2021: Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 7/6/21 Defendant, HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE COUNTY OF KERN Demurrer to Plaintiffs' Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer - Demurrer 08/10/2021: Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 7/6/21 Defendant, HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE COUNTY OF KERN Demurrer to Plaintiffs' Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketReply - Comment: to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Demurrer to Plaintiffs' Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketOpposition to Demurrer - Comment: and Points and Authorities in support thereof

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - Comment: Demurrer to Plaintiffs Complaint Hearing Date: 8/10/21 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Proof of Service : The Court House address is incorrect. Item #3.b. needs to have an Authorized Agent for Service listed to accept service. Last, Item #6. is incomplete. Please review.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Assignment to Judge for All Purposes - Comment: Judge Barmann, Dept. 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: re: Summons: Summons does not conform to the Complaint - Please double check the placement of parties on the Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketApplication / Order Appointing Guardian ad Litem (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: The Court Orders that Brandi Robbins is hereby appointed as the Guardian ad Litem for Mia De La Rosa

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketApplication / Order Appointing Guardian ad Litem (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: The Court Orders that Brandi Robbins is hereby appointed as the Guardian ad Litem for Eliana De La Rosa

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketApplication / Order Appointing Guardian ad Litem (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: The Court Orders that Brandi Robbins is hereby appointed as the Guardian ad Litem for Angel De La Rosa

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 08/12/2021 Hearing Time: 9:15AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dhillon, Summit S.