This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/08/2021 at 18:35:05 (UTC).

RITCHIE VS BEAR VALLEY COMMUNITY SERVICES DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 07/24/2020 RITCHIE filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against BEAR VALLEY COMMUNITY SERVICES DISTRICT. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bradshaw, J. Eric and Palmer - Retired, William D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1732

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bradshaw, J. Eric

Palmer - Retired, William D.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RITCHIE, BRADLEY

Respondent

BEAR VALLEY COMMUNITY SERVICES DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BAUMANN, ROBERT L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Assignment to Judge for All Purposes - Comment: Reassigned to Judge William D Palmer for all purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Assignment to Judge for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEAR VALLEY COMMUNITY SERVICES DISTRICT, A CALIFORNIA COMMUNITY SERVICE DISTRICT is a litigant