This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 19:19:42 (UTC).

RIGGS VS RIGGS

Case Summary

On 09/19/2017 RIGGS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RIGGS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Webster, Jason W. and Pritchard, Kenneth G.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0320

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Webster, Jason W.

Pritchard, Kenneth G.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RIGGS, MONTY R

Respondent

RIGGS, DONNA M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GELBER, JAMIE P

Respondent Attorneys

WILLIAMS, GEORGIA L

CHRISTIAN, DIANA L

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order Before Hearing; Party: Names: RIGGS, MONTY R; RIGGS, DONNA M; Comment: AMENDED STIPULATED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketAmended Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketAmended Stipulated Judgment - Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.; Comment: STATUS DATE 5/16/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order Before Hearing; Party: Names: RIGGS, MONTY R; RIGGS, DONNA M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Comment: STATUS DATE 5/16/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketDeclaration for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Sub of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration - Comment: Income and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketResponse - Comment: Response to Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less