This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/13/2023 at 09:32:48 (UTC).

RIDGECREST TC, LLC VS PRESTON

Case Summary

On 03/14/2022 RIDGECREST TC, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against PRESTON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0057

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RIDGECREST TC, LLC

Defendant

PRESTON, JENNIFER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRAN MARIE C.

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

03/14/2022: Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

03/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Unlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet

03/14/2022: Unlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

03/14/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

04/15/2022: Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

Judgment by Default by Court

04/19/2022: Judgment by Default by Court

Request for Dismissal (Partial)

04/15/2022: Request for Dismissal (Partial)

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

04/15/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

04/15/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Application for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit

04/15/2022: Application for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit

Writ of Possession Issued

04/15/2022: Writ of Possession Issued

Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

08/02/2022: Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Judgment by Default by Court; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - RIDGECREST TC, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Writ of Possession Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Application for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit; Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: Unknown Occupants; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - RIDGECREST TC, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: J.Preston; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - RIDGECREST TC, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Dismissal (Partial); Comment: w/o Prejudice as to Does 1-10, inclusive; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - RIDGECREST TC, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - RIDGECREST TC, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Comment: Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - RIDGECREST TC, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Unlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet; Comment: Plaintiff's Mandatory; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - RIDGECREST TC, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - RIDGECREST TC, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint - Unlawful Detainer; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - RIDGECREST TC, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less