This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/20/2018 at 23:24:20 (UTC).

RIDGECREST HOUSING INVESTORS, LP VS STAPLES, ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/17/2016 RIDGECREST HOUSING INVESTORS, LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against STAPLES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0086

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RIDGECREST HOUSING INVESTORS, LP

Defendants

STAPLES, MSKIZZI S.

LARS, DEVON M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EVANS, CHRIS J

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

**MO w/Declaration of Mailing:

Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

MO - UD FILED 5-17-16: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2016
  • Cause of Action: Unlawful Detainer Final Money Judgment; Type: Action; Filed By: 11294; Filed Against: 1129411294

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: RIDGECREST HOUSING INVESTORS, LP; Awarded Against: STAPLES, MSKIZZI S.; LARS, DEVON M.; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $1,234.00; Holdover Damages: $1,869.30; Attorney Fees: $276.20; Costs: $540.00; Total: $3,919.50; Party: Names: RIDGECREST HOUSING INVESTORS, LP; STAPLES, MSKIZZI S.; LARS, DEVON M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: RIDGECREST HOUSING INVESTORS, LP; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 340 S. DOWNS STREET #602 RIDGECREST, CA 93555; Awarded Against: STAPLES, MSKIZZI S.; LARS, DEVON M.; Party: Names: RIDGECREST HOUSING INVESTORS, LP; STAPLES, MSKIZZI S.; LARS, DEVON M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • Judgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • Cause Of Action - Action Unlawful Detainer Final Money Judgment; File Date: 10/17/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration for Default Judgment by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • Request For Entry of Default Not Entered - Comment: For the Following Reason(s): Previously entered 8-4-16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Does 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • Writ Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Ruling - **MO w/Declaration of Mailing:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • Ruling - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: RIDGECREST HOUSING INVESTORS, LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • Statement of Classification and Location - Comment: STATEMENT OF LOCATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer - Comment: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: CIVIL CASE CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.