This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/19/2018 at 04:57:28 (UTC).

RIDGE INVESTORS, LP VS THOMPSON

Case Summary

On 10/23/2015 RIDGE INVESTORS, LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against THOMPSON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K., Glennon, Donald P., Jr. and Pritchard, Kenneth G.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0174

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Pritchard, Kenneth G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RIDGE INVESTORS, LP

Defendant

THOMPSON, KAMIKO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EVANS, CHRIS J

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: CHOICE HOTELS

Ruling

Ruling 12-5-16: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2016
  • Cause of Action: Unlawful Detainer Final Money Judgment; Type: Action; Filed By: 11416; Filed Against: 11416

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: RIDGE INVESTORS, LP; Awarded Against: THOMPSON, KAMIKO; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $489.00; Holdover Damages: $961.70; Attorney Fees: $177.04; Costs: $445.00; Total: $2,072.74; Party: Names: RIDGE INVESTORS, LP; THOMPSON, KAMIKO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: RIDGE INVESTORS, LP; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 528 N. Gold Canyon Street Ridgecrest, CA 93555; Awarded Against: THOMPSON, KAMIKO; Party: Names: RIDGE INVESTORS, LP; THOMPSON, KAMIKO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Writ of Execution Issued - Comment: KERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Memorandum of Costs and Credits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: CHOICE HOTELS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Writ of Execution Issued - Comment: SACRAMENTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Memorandum of Costs and Credits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Notice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • Final Judgment/Unlawful Detainer - Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2015
  • Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution Possession or - Comment: Sale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • Judgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: ALL UNNAMED OCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: KAMIKO THOMPSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: RIDGE INVESTORS, LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • Statement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.