This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:36:13 (UTC).

RICHLAND CHEVROLET VS ZAKLAN, ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 RICHLAND CHEVROLET filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ZAKLAN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Shayer, Steven, Palmer, William D., Camacho, Marcos R. and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0029

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Shayer, Steven

Palmer, William D.

Camacho, Marcos R.

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RICHLAND CHEVROLET

Defendants

ZAKLAN, ANGIE

ZAKLAN, JUSTIN

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 01/05/2018: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dismissed; Comment: Failure to prosecute

Small Claims Trial

Small Claims Trial 12/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Palmer, William D.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Other Before Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketDismissed Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 01/05/2018: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dismissed; Comment: Failure to prosecute

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Small Claims Trial 12/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO JUSTIN ZAKLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: AS TO AMGIE ZAKLAN WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: RICHLAND CHEVROLET; Served: 10/25/201710:55 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less