Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 22:02:50 (UTC).

RICHARD KUHN ET AL VS FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 RICHARD KUHN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FORD MOTOR COMPANY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Brumfield, Lorna H.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0462

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Brumfield, Lorna H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KUHN, STEPHANIE M.

KUHN, RICHARD G.

Defendant

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCGEE, WILLIAM R

Defendant Attorney

ARENS, MARY LYNN

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

**MO - Public cmc: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF PETITION FOR COORDINATION SUBMITTED 12-28-15

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Entire Action is dismissed with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • Further Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: RE: SUBMISSION OF PETITION FOR COORDINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • Service Copy / Coordination Proceeding

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • Ruling - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • Service Copy / Coordination Proceeding

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • Service Copy / Coordination Proceeding

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - **MO - Public cmc: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF PETITION FOR COORDINATION SUBMITTED 12-28-15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • Service Copy / Coordination Proceeding - Comment: Notice of Order Assigning Coordination Motion Judge and Setting Date for hearing. Submitted by Mary Lynn Arens, Esq.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • Service Copy / Coordination Proceeding

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2015
  • Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: VIA ACS TO: MARY LYNN ARENS RE: NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF PETITION FOR COORDINATION REASON: PURSUANT TO HONORABLE SIDNEY P CHAPIN, RE-SUBMIT NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF PETITION FOR COORDINATION OMITTING EXHIBIT C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: re; case management statement returned via usps

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: by personal service as to Ford Motor Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/30/2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 A.M. Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less