This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/23/2018 at 08:38:13 (UTC).

RHODES VS GAILES

Case Summary

On 02/16/2017 RHODES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GAILES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Glennon, Donald P., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0105

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RHODES, FRED

Defendant

GAILES, CECIL

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ENTRY OF DEFAULT, JUDGMENT, WRIT

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal 06/22/17: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 06/08/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Plaintiff: RHODES, FRED

Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c): AMENDED- Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c): Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 07/06/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Dismissed

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ENTRY OF DEFAULT & JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Lack of Prosecution Before Trial; Party: Names: RHODES, FRED; GAILES, CECIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 07/06/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal 06/22/17: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ENTRY OF DEFAULT, JUDGMENT, WRIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 06/08/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Plaintiff: RHODES, FRED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ENTRY OF DEFAULT & JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c): AMENDED- Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c): Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: as to Unknown Occupants---------------------POS inadequate.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE & JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • Request For Entry of Default Not Entered - Comment: For the Following Reason(s): NO POS FOR UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: FOR CECIL GAILES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: APPLICATION AND ORDER TO POST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • Application and Order - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: RHODES, FRED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.