This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/31/2023 at 14:41:36 (UTC).

REYNA, ET AL VS MELVIN RAMIREZ

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 REYNA, filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MELVIN RAMIREZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0091

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

REYNA, MARIA ISABEL

CORONA, MIRNA RAMIREZ

Defendant

MELVIN RAMIREZ, MELVIN ANTONIO RAMIREZ BARRAGALA AKA

 

Court Documents

Judgment by Default by Clerk

01/09/2023: Judgment by Default by Clerk

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

12/22/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Letter Mailed

12/01/2022: Letter Mailed

Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

11/18/2022: Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

11/18/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Electronic Rejection Notice

01/06/2023: Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice

01/06/2023: Electronic Rejection Notice

Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

12/22/2022: Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

11/18/2022: Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketFile Type: Writ of Possession Issued; Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - REYNA, MARIA ISABEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Application for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit; Comment: APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - REYNA, MARIA ISABEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Judgment by Default by Clerk; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - REYNA, MARIA ISABEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment; Comment: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERKS JUDGMENT; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - REYNA, MARIA ISABEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: DEFAULT; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CORONA, MIRNA RAMIREZ|PLAINTIFF - REYNA, MARIA ISABEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: JUDGMENT; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CORONA, MIRNA RAMIREZ|PLAINTIFF - REYNA, MARIA ISABEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: JUDGMENT; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CORONA, MIRNA RAMIREZ|PLAINTIFF - REYNA, MARIA ISABEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: POS - ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CORONA, MIRNA RAMIREZ|PLAINTIFF - REYNA, MARIA ISABEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: POS - MELVIN; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CORONA, MIRNA RAMIREZ|PLAINTIFF - REYNA, MARIA ISABEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered; Comment: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CORONA, MIRNA RAMIREZ|PLAINTIFF - REYNA, MARIA ISABEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Letter Mailed; Comment: Order To Post; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CORONA, MIRNA RAMIREZ|PLAINTIFF - REYNA, MARIA ISABEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration and Order to Post Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CORONA, MIRNA RAMIREZ|PLAINTIFF - REYNA, MARIA ISABEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Address and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property; Comment: 516 STUART STREET ARVIN CA 93203 COUNTY OF KERN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint - Unlawful Detainer; Comment: COMPLAINT; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CORONA, MIRNA RAMIREZ|PLAINTIFF - REYNA, MARIA ISABEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CORONA, MIRNA RAMIREZ|PLAINTIFF - REYNA, MARIA ISABEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Verification by Landlord Regarding Rental Assistance; Comment: Verification by Landlord; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CORONA, MIRNA RAMIREZ|PLAINTIFF - REYNA, MARIA ISABEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Unlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S MANDATORY COVER SHEET; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CORONA, MIRNA RAMIREZ|PLAINTIFF - REYNA, MARIA ISABEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CORONA, MIRNA RAMIREZ|PLAINTIFF - REYNA, MARIA ISABEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less