This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/27/2020 at 04:18:27 (UTC).

REYES VS REYES

Case Summary

On 08/08/2012 REYES filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against REYES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Errea, Larry A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1572

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Errea, Larry A.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

REYES, JOE ANGEL

Respondent

REYES, NICOLE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2012
  • DocketNP1040 - Comment: Department: BS Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: PETITIONER'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: REQUEST FOR ORDER THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: JOE ANGEL REYES (PE-1) APPEARS WITH B SCOTT WINKLER ESQ. NO APPEARANCE BY RESPONDENT RESPONDENT FAILED TO APPEAR FOR MEDIATION COURT GRANTS ORDERS AS REQUESTED VISITATION WITH RESPONDENT IS TO BE SUPERVISED BY GILBERT REYES. RESPONDENT TO DRUG TEST WITH FOUR HOURS NOTICE PAID FOR BY THE PETITIONER. A FAILURE TO APPEAR WILL BE DEEMED AS A POSITIVE TEST. IF RESPONDENT FAILS TO APPEAR OR HAS A DIRTY TEST, RESPONDENT TO REIMBURSE PETITIONER FOR THE COST OF THE TEST PETITIONER TO PREPARE ORDER AFTER HEARING. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2012
  • Docket4106 Order to Show Cause (Pet) - Comment: Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: NO POS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2012
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Petitioner - Original Type: Order to Show Cause - Petitioner; Judicial Officer: Errea, Larry A.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: CONV; Comment: NO POS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • DocketMother Failed to Appear for Mediation - Comment: Document Imaged

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • Docket4999 Mediation Appointment - Comment: Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: SHAFTER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Original Type: Mediation Appointment; Judicial Officer: Mediator, FCS; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: CONV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2012
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2012
  • DocketNP1085 - Comment: Department: AS Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: REVIEW RE: CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: JOE ANGEL REYES (PE-1) APPEARS WITH B SCOTT WINKLER ESQ. COURT REPORTER WAIVED PURSUANT TO STIPULATION OF COUNSEL. HEARING RECORDED BY ELECTRONIC RECORDING THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: EX PARTE PETITION GRANTED. TEMPORARY ORDERS GRANTED AS PRAYED WITH EXCEPTION TO RANDOM DRUG TESTING AND WORDING " REASONABLE NOTICE" AND "REASONABLE PERIOD" INSERTED BY JUDGE CASE REFERRED TO MEDIATION MEDIATION SET 9/27/12 AT 9:00AM CASE IS SET FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 9/28/12 AT 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2012
  • Docket4037 Ex Parte - Comment: Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: FILED BY PETITIONER RE: CHILD CUSTODY/VISITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2012
  • DocketEx Parte Hearing - Original Type: Ex Parte Hearing; Judicial Officer: Errea, Larry A.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: CONV; Comment: FILED BY PETITIONER RE: CHILD CUSTODY/VISITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2012
  • Docket172F Pmt: Motion/Stip/OSC/Demurrer GC 70617(A) - Comment: Amount of $60.00 for REYES, JOE ANGEL (PE-1). Received from JOE REYES. Receipt #670089 for amount of $60.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2012
  • DocketEx Parte Compliance - Comment: FILED BY PETITIONER HEARING DATE: 8/9/2012 HEARING TIME: 1330 HEARING DIV/DEPT: AS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2012
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: FILED BY PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2012
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2012
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2012
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 721

    Read MoreRead Less