Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 06:05:23 (UTC).

REYES-MENDOZA ET AL VS PAN PACIFIC PETROLEUM COMPANY, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/28/2016 REYES-MENDOZA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PAN PACIFIC PETROLEUM COMPANY, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R., Clark, Thomas S. and Friedman, Gary T.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1760

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Clark, Thomas S.

Friedman, Gary T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

REYES-MENDOZA, FRANCISCA

PLATAS, BRENDA

Defendants

WORLD OIL MARKETING COMPANY

PAN PACIFIC PETROLEUM COMPANY, INC.

WILLFORD, DAVID K.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DELJA, DENIS M

Defendant Attorney

LAPLANTE, CHARLES K.

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Minute Order 3/16/2018: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Minute Order Dated 12-1-17: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 11/30/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filed 11/29/17 Filed by J. Kyle Gaines on behalf of Defendants DEFENDANTS PAN PACIFIC PETROLEUM COMPANY, INC. AND WORLD OIL MARKETING COMPANY'S EX PARTS APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS;; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: DELJA, DENIS M; Plaintiff; Attorney: DELJA, DENIS M

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further 11/30/2017: Judicial Officer: Friedman, Gary T.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: (continued from 10/27/2017); Parties Present Plaintiff: REYES-MENDOZA, FRANCISCA; Attorney: DELJA, DENIS M; Plaintiff: PLATAS, BRENDA; Attorney: DELJA, DENIS M

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Notices rejected in File and Serve

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 11/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: DELJA, DENIS M; Plaintiff; Attorney: DELJA, DENIS M

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 11/17/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: FILED 11/16/17 FILED BY FARHEENA A. HABIB ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO COMPEL MENTAL HEALTH EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF BRENDA PLAYAS, OR ALTERNATIVELY, SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING MOTION TO COMPEL MENTAL HEALTH EXAMINATION

Ruling

Ruling 11/16/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Ruling

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 11/13/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filed by Farheena A. Habib Attorney for Defendants Pan Pacific Petroleum Company, Inc., David K. Willford and World Oil Marketing Company Filed 11/3/17 FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL, OR ALTERNATIVELY, SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE CONTINUED FROM 11/6/17 TO 11/13/17 FOR COUNSEL TO MEET AND CONFER; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: DELJA, DENIS M; Plaintiff; Attorney: DELJA, DENIS M

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 11/06/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filed by Farheena A. Habib Attorney for Defendants Pan Pacific Petroleum Company, Inc., David K. Willford and World Oil Marketing Company Filed 11/3/17 FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL, OR ALTERNATIVELY, SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: DELJA, DENIS M; Plaintiff; Attorney: DELJA, DENIS M

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 10/27/2017: Judicial Officer: Friedman, Gary T.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff: REYES-MENDOZA, FRANCISCA; Attorney: DELJA, DENIS M; Plaintiff: PLATAS, BRENDA; Attorney: DELJA, DENIS M

Motion to Continue

Motion (Pre-Disposition) 10/10/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Defendants Pan Pacific Petroleum Company, Inc.; David K. Willford; and World Oil Marketing Company Motion to Continue Trial dates (Jury Trial/Final Case Management Conference currently set: 11/27/17 and MSC 10/27/17 D-3 9am); Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: DELJA, DENIS M; Plaintiff; Attorney: DELJA, DENIS M

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 09/28/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filed 9-26-17 Moving Party: Defendants Pan Pacific Petroleum Company, Inc.; David K. Willford; and World Oil Marketing Company Ex-Parte Application for an Order Continuing Trial, or Alternatively, Shortening Time for Hearing Motion to Continue Trial Date; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: DELJA, DENIS M; Plaintiff; Attorney: DELJA, DENIS M

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 02/02/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

Ruling

Ruling 01/25/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Ruling

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: CRC 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal - Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Minute Order 3/16/2018: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: WITH PREJUDICE AS TO COMPLAINT AND CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFF BRENDA PLATAS ONLY. EACH SIDE TO BEAR THEIR OWN COSTS. THIS IS NOT A DISMISSAL OF THE COMPLAINT AND CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFF REYES-MENDOZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketRuling/Certificate of Progress - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: OSC set for 3/6/2018 is continued to 4/6/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Progress

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: t/e: 5 - 7 days (jury requested by all)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketMotion for Judgment on Pleadings - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

    Read MoreRead Less
74 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2016
  • DocketAnswer to First Amended Complaint - Comment: FILED BY CHARLES K. LAPLANTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint AS TO PAN PACIFIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint WORLD OIL MARKETING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint - Comment: First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 11/14/16 Hearing Time: 08:30 Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 08/23/2016; Served: 08/27/2016; Served: 08/23/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PAN PACIFIC PETROLEUM INC is a litigant

Latest cases where WORLD OIL MARKETING COMPANY INC. is a litigant