This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 01:39:36 (UTC).

REVFINN LTD VS FLORES, ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/19/2015 REVFINN LTD filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against FLORES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Phillips, Craig G., Witt, Gary R., Staley, H.A. "Skip" and Staley, H. A. "Skip". The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0009

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Phillips, Craig G.

Witt, Gary R.

Staley, H.A. "Skip"

Staley, H. A. "Skip"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REVFINN LTD

Defendants

MORENO, SARA

FLORES, RUBEN

 

Court Documents

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court)

MO - Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court): Judicial Officer: Staley, H.A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Judgment; Comment: Answer Filed by Ruben Flores and Sara Moreno; Parties Present Plaintiff: REVFINN LTD; Defendant: FLORES, RUBEN; Defendant: MORENO, SARA

Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

MO - Order to Show Cause: Judicial Officer: Staley, H.A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: RE: DISMISSAL; Parties Present Plaintiff: REVFINN LTD

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • DocketJudgment after Trial - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Comment: Total $2,565.80 As to Ruben Flores

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Clerical Error; Comment: Continued from 10/29/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Court Finding After Court Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: REVFINN LTD; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: FLORES, RUBEN; MORENO, SARA; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $2,158.30; Total: $2,158.30; Party: Names: REVFINN LTD; FLORES, RUBEN; MORENO, SARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - MO - Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court): Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Judgment; Comment: Answer Filed by Ruben Flores and Sara Moreno

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • DocketNotice of Trial - Comment: Date: 10/29/15 At: 1:30 PM Dept: A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • DocketRequest/Counter Request to Set Case for Trial (UD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - MO - Order to Show Cause: Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Comment: Granted as to Ruben Flores

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Comment: Granted as to Sara Moreno

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: by personal service as to Sara Moreno

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: REVFINN LTD; Unserved; Served: 05/29/20156:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 2401 GREGG LANE ARVIN, CA 93203 Kern County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Returned VIA In Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.