This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/21/2021 at 12:38:06 (UTC).

REVERSE MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS, INC. VS BICKMORE, JR. ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/06/2020 REVERSE MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS, INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BICKMORE, JR. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1822

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REVERSE MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Defendants

HENRY C. BICKMORE JR. REVOCABLE TRUST, DATED DECEMBER 7, 2007

ALL OTHER PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN, OR INTEREST IN THE REAL PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO THE PLAINTIFF'S INTEREST OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFF'S RIGHT THERETO

BICKMORE, HENRY C., Jr.

THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPEMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DUNN, NICOLE S

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: 2@ Judgments - resubmit one Judgment on Pleading adding costs instead of a separate Judgment for costs. Also Letter received instructed how to request a Prove-Up hearing.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to The Secretary of Housing and Urban Development Correct Proof of Service: Service is not complete until the signed slip is returned to you and attached to this POS-010.

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC-NFT (N18C): Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 11/19/20 Hearing Time: 8:30 Hearing Department/Division: 12

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketDefault - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Comment: Prove-Up

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketDefault Setting Card - Comment: Hrg. March 25, 2021 D-12 @ 8:30am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs - Comment: Memorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without prejudice as to Does 1-20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketRequest for Court Judgment - Comment: Request for Court Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice - Comment: Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Plaintiff's Application for Default Judgment Against Defendants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration of Alicia Powers in Support of Applicaton for Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration of Nicole S. Dunn in Support of Request for Entry of Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to The Secretary of Housing and Urban Development Correct Proof of Service: Service is not complete until the signed slip is returned to you and attached to this POS-010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Henry C. Bickmore Jr. an individual. Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Henry C. Bickmore Jr. Revocable Trust, Dated December 7, 2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 08/20/2020; Served: 08/20/2020; Served: 09/14/2020; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC-NFT (N18C): Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 11/19/20 Hearing Time: 8:30 Hearing Department/Division: 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REVERSE MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Secretary of Housing and Urban Development is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DUNN NICOLE STEPHANIE