This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 04:22:41 (UTC).

Rendon VS Bustillos Rendon

Case Summary

On 06/30/2015 Rendon filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Bustillos Rendon. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K., Pritchard, Kenneth G., McKnight, Ralph L., Jr., Woodward, Cory J. and Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5614

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Pritchard, Kenneth G.

McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.

Woodward, Cory J.

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

RENDON, FRANK

RENDON, FRANK, Jr.

Defendants and Respondents

BUSTILLOS, ROSA

Bustillos Rendon, Rosa Bonita

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

PACIONE, LISA M

 

Court Documents

Motion (DCSS)

7/27/16 MO: MOTION (DCSS) RE: JUDGMENT, CHILD SUPPORT, HEALTH CARE AND PARENTAGE: Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: DCSS NOM JUDGMENT C/S H/C PARENTAGE 2 MINORS; Parties Present Petitioner: Rendon, Frank

Request for Order - Respondent

06/27/16 MO: Request for Order- Respondent: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dropped; Parties Present Petitioner: Rendon, Frank

Request for Order - Respondent

**MO - Petitioner/Respondent Request for Order/Order to Show Cause re: Domestic Violence: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Parties Present Petitioner: Rendon, Frank; Respondent: Bustillos Rendon, Rosa Bonita

Confirmation of Special Setting

MO: Confirmation of Special Setting: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

Confirmation of Special Setting

MO: Confirmation of Special Setting: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: Rendon, Frank

Confirmation of Special Setting

MINUTE ORDER 10/09/15: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: Rendon, Frank

Ex Parte Hearing

MO: Ex Parte Hearing: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: Rendon, Frank; Respondent: Bustillos Rendon, Rosa Bonita

Request for Order - Petitioner

MINUTE ORDER 08/03/15: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: Rendon, Frank; Respondent: Bustillos Rendon, Rosa Bonita

Ex Parte Hearing

MO 07/01/15: Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: Rendon, Frank

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

MO 05/23/16 DIV C: Respondent's Order to Show Cause re: Domestic Violence: Judicial Officer: Woodward, Cory J.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Petitioner: RENDON, FRANK, Jr.; Respondent: BUSTILLOS, ROSA

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

05/23/16 MO: Order to Show Cause (B): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Department Transfer; Parties Present Petitioner: RENDON, FRANK, Jr.; Respondent: BUSTILLOS, ROSA

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

04/25/16 MO: Respondent's Order to Show Cause re: DV/CC/V/CS/RECORD COMM FILED 04/12/16: Judicial Officer: Woodward, Cory J.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: RENDON, FRANK, Jr.; Respondent: BUSTILLOS, ROSA

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

04/25/16 MO: Order to Show Cause (B): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Department Transfer; Parties Present Petitioner: RENDON, FRANK, Jr.; Respondent: BUSTILLOS, ROSA

Confirmation of Special Setting

MO: Confirmation of Special Setting: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Respondent; Attorney: PACIONE, LISA M

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2016
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • DocketDeclaration for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • DocketAppearance Stipulation and Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • DocketStipulation for Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • DocketDCSS: Findings and Order After Hearing - Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Comment: HRG 7/27/16-DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • DocketState Guideline Calculation (DCSS) - Comment: marked #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • DocketState Guideline Calculation (DCSS) - Comment: marked #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • DocketDCSS: Advisement of Rights Pursuant to FC 4251(b)(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2015
  • DocketResponse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • DocketNeither Party Appeared for Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - MINUTE ORDER 08/03/15: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Hearing - MO 07/01/15: Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • DocketEx Parte Compliance - Comment: Hearing Date: 7/1/15 Hearing Time: 1:30 Hearing Department/Division: BM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • DocketNotice of Limited Scope Representation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.