This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:47:06 (UTC).

REHKOPF VS FCA US LLC

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 REHKOPF filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Chapin, Sidney P.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0709

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Chapin, Sidney P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

REHKOPF, STEPHANIE

REHKOPF, CLINTON

Defendants

CJM AUTOMOTIVE GROUP INC. D/B/A BAKERSFIELD CHRYSLER JEEP FIAT, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

FCA US LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOVASZ, CHRISTOPHER M.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 7/19/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:4

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: CRC 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketNotice of Settlement - Conditional - Comment: Filed by Charles J. Lee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO CJM AUTOMOTIVE GROUP ,INC DBA BAKERSFIELD CHRYSLER JEEP FIAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to FCA US LLC. Personal Service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 04/11/2017; Served: 04/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 7/19/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURN VIA E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less