This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:48:09 (UTC).

REGALADO VS JAVIER

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 REGALADO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JAVIER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Loo, Cynthia L.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1762

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Loo, Cynthia L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

REGALADO, BRENDA RICO

Respondent

JAVIER, ANIBAL RESENDIZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketChild Support Registry Received for Forwarding to SDU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: In Compliance; Comment: 4/12/2018 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: HRG 5/18/2018 DIV E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.