This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:50:18 (UTC).

REFIELD VS JACKSON

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 REFIELD filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JACKSON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Stainfield, Bryan K.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1773

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Stainfield, Bryan K.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

REFIELD, SARAH

JACKSON, RYAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: JUDGEMENT OF DISSOLUTION AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Summary Dissolution Before Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • DocketJudgment - Summary Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Comment: STATUS ENDS 9/25/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketJoint Petition for Summary Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.