This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/20/2022 at 07:20:17 (UTC).

REEDY VS URNER'S ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/22/2021 REEDY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against URNER'S. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1663

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REEDY, YESSICA

Defendants

URNER'S

COGENCY GLOBAL INC.

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Trial

Small Claims Trial 01/14/2022: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Held

Small Claims Trial

Small Claims Trial 02/04/2022: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 01/14/22 - Mediator/SC-109

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketExhibit(s) List

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketExhibit(s) List

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: Eldon King

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketAudio streaming announced.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Small Claims Trial 02/04/2022: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 01/14/22 - Mediator/SC-109

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketAudio streaming announced.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Small Claims Trial 01/14/2022: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketLetter Received - Comment: Letter From: COGENCY GLOBAL INC. Date of Letter: 11/30/2021 Re: PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCertified Mail Claimed - Comment: AS TO COGENCY GLOBAL INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCertified Mail Claimed - Comment: AS TO URNER'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 12/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: REEDY, YESSICA; Served: 11/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Requesting Certified Service of Claim - Comment: AS TO COGENCY GLOBAL INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Sent to Defendant by Certified Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Sent to Defendant by Certified Mail - Comment: AS TO URNER'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Requesting Certified Service of Claim - Comment: AS TO DEFENDANT URNER'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: Guide & File FW-001 Request for Fee Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: Guide & File SC-100 Small Claims Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where URNER'S is a litigant

Latest cases where COGENCY GLOBAL INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant