Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 04:56:06 (UTC).

RED BALLOON REALTY VS BALDWIN

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 RED BALLOON REALTY filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BALDWIN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0064

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RED BALLOON REALTY

Defendant

BALDWIN, JEFFERY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOSTER, STEVEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2016
  • DocketWrit Returned Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Unlawful Detainer Final Money Judgment; Type: Action; Filed By: 10518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • DocketCause Of Action - Action Unlawful Detainer Final Money Judgment; File Date: 09/18/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV); Party: Names: RED BALLOON REALTY; BALDWIN, JEFFERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (UD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: RED BALLOON REALTY; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 233 Sahara Ridgecrest, CA 93555; Awarded Against: BALDWIN, JEFFERY; Party: Names: RED BALLOON REALTY; BALDWIN, JEFFERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Execution Possession or - Comment: Sale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: Jeffery Baldwin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: BOSTER, STEVEN, RED BALLOON REALTY; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RED BALLOON REALTY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOSTER, STEVEN