This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 09:32:17 (UTC).

RECIO VS ALLIED BARTON SECURITY SERVICES, L.P. ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/15/2015 RECIO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ALLIED BARTON SECURITY SERVICES, L P. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Brumfield, Lorna H.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0988

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Brumfield, Lorna H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RECIO, HERLINDA

Defendants

SANCHEZ, WENDY

ALLIED BARTON SECURITY SERVICES, L.P.

LUNA, HECTOR

EVAN, ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FARZAM, JOSEPH S

Defendant Attorney

FOSTER, KIMBERLY M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Re; Dismissal Returned; via Active Legal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Entire action is dismissed with prejudice. (VIA AMS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • DocketNotice of Entry - Comment: Joint Stipulation re Resolution of this Matter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Unconditional

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Comment: The Parties hereby Stipulate: 1. The Court shall set an OSC re settlement in this matter for March 14, 2016 at 8:15 a.m. 2. Defendants are relieved of their obligation to file a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiffs Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: re; stipulation returned via active legal

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2015
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Kimberly M Foster in support of joint stipulation to extend time to file responsive pleading

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: PERSONAL, AS TO, ALLIED BARTON SECURITY SERVICES, L.P. 9/17/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: SUBSTITUTED, AS TO, WENDY SANCHEZ. 9/21/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: SUBSTITUTED, AS TO, HECTOR LUNA. 9/21/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: SUBSTITUTED, AS TO, ROBERT EVAN. 9/21/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 09/17/2015; Served: 09/21/2015; Served: 09/21/2015; Served: 09/21/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 12/30/15 Hearing Time: 830 AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Comment: FILED BY JOSEPH FARZAM CMC 3/14/16 @ 815 AM D17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less