This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/03/2021 at 17:07:45 (UTC).

REALTY DIMENSIONS, INC. VS BACA

Case Summary

On 02/04/2020 REALTY DIMENSIONS, INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BACA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0821

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REALTY DIMENSIONS, INC.

Defendants

BACA, MARY A.

BACA, MARY ANNE

BACA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YOUNG, ROBERT MORRIS

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

LSE Notice of OTA-OSC 3.15.1(c)-Mail:

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketWrit Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - LSE Notice of OTA-OSC 3.15.1(c)-Mail: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: REALTY DIMENSIONS, INC.; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 224 Wilson Ave., #D Bakersfield, CA 93308 Kern County; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; Awarded Against: BACA, MARY A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: Returned Via File and Serve

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered - Comment: As to Mary A. Baca aka Mary Anne Baca

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: As to Mary A. Baca aka Mary Anne Baca

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to All Unknown Occupants, sub serve

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Mary A. Baca aka Mary Anne Baca, Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: REALTY DIMENSIONS, INC.; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - LSE Notice of OTA-OSC 3.15.1(c)-Mail:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 224 Wilson Ave., #D Bakersfield, CA 93308

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Baca is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YOUNG, ROBERT MORRIS