This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:50:36 (UTC).

RAYMOND LAMONT INGRAM DECEASED

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 RAYMOND LAMONT INGRAM DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Seidman, David, Knight, Alisa R., Bittleston, Dawn, Kendall, Andrew, Friedman - Retired, Gary T. and Myers, Brett. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2258

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Seidman, David

Knight, Alisa R.

Bittleston, Dawn

Kendall, Andrew

Friedman - Retired, Gary T.

Myers, Brett

 

Party Details

Petitioners

MCMILLAM, KATRINA

MORELOCK, LORI

INGRAM, RAYMONE

Not Classified By Court

MCMILLAN, KATRINA

BONILLA, JUDITH EVELIN

MORELOCK, LORI E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

COX, LARRY R

McDONALD, STEVIE JO

STEAD, CALVIN R

OLDFIELD, GERALD H

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Request for special notice returned via outbasket

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Request for special notice returned to attorney via outbasket

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Request for special notice returned to attorney via outbasket

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for Letters...returned via in pro per out basket

Petition for Letters

Petition for Letters 04/27/2017: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Special...returned via AMS

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for Letters...returned via AMS

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Stipulation and order returned via file & serve

Petition for Letters

Petition for Letters 01/16/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES - 1. Need date of birth for minor, Kai Ingram by way of verified supplement. 2. Unable to determine bond amount. Need estimated value of personal property by way of verified supplement. 3. Additional persons listed on proof of service filed 01/10/20 and not listed on #8 of petition. Need relationships, ages & addresses by way of verified supplement. 4. Proof of service filed 01/10/20 indicates service is 6 days short and must be 15 days before the hearing.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Petition for Letters...returned via file & serve

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Petition for Letters...returned via file & serve

Compliance Hearing

Petition 11/08/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - (as to Co-Administrators/Lori Morelock and Katrina McMillam) SAME NOTE - 1. As of 10/30/19, 12200 Status Report or Petition to Close Estate has not been submitted for filing. 11/08/19 CALENDAR #01

Petition

Petition 09/05/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - PETITION FOR SUSPENSION OF POWERS AND REMOVAL OF ADMINISTRATORS; AND FOR APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Substution of attorney to Stevie Jo McDonald for Raymone Ingram

Ex Parte Hearing

Petition 10/26/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEAARING- RE: PETITION FOR COURT SUPERVISION AND ORDER APPROVING SALE OF FORMER BUSINESS OF DECEDENT KNOWN AS "J'S PLACE" [PROBATE CODE SECTIONS 10500, 10512, AND 10580] 10/26/2018 CALENDAR #2

Ex Parte Hearing

Ex Parte Hearing 09/21/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- Petition for court supervision and order approving sale of former business of decedent know as "J's Place" [Probate code sections 10500, 10512, and 10580]

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Ex parte and petition...returned via AMS

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Inventory & appraisal

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: PETITION FOR SUSPENSION OF POWERS AND REMOVAL OF ADMINISTRATORS; AND FOR APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR (PC8500, et seq.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: PETITION FOR SUSPENSION OF POWERS AND REMOVAL OF ADMINISTRATORS; AND FOR APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR (PC8500, et seq.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: PETITION FOR SUSPENSION OF POWERS AND REMOVAL OF ADMINISTRATORS; AND FOR APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR (PC8500, et seq.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketPetition for Letters - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: ***EFFECTIVE 3/23/2020, HEARING CONTINUED FROM 04/02/2020*** RE: ADMINISTRATION AUTHORIZATION TO ADMINISTER UNDER THE INDEPENDENT ADMINISTRATION OF ESTATES ACT WITH FULL AUTHORITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: ***EFFECTIVE 3/23/2020, HEARING CONTINUED FROM 04/02/2020*** RE 12200 STATUS REPORT OR PETITION TO CLOSE ESTATE (as to Co-Administrators/Lori Morelock and Katrina McMilliam)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketOrder to Appear - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: ***EFFECTIVE 3/23/2020, HEARING CONTINUED FROM 04/02/2020*** Katrina McMillam and Lori Morelock to appear before the court and show the condition of the estate and the reasons why the estate cannot be distributed and closed, and why sanctions should not be imposed up the $1,500.00 pursuant to CCP 177.5 for failure to follow court orders and failure to file status report as required by Probate Code Section 12200

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: ***EFFECTIVE 3/23/2020, HEARING CONTINUED FROM 04/02/2020*** RE: Attorney Gerald Oldfield to file a responsive pleading on or by 5/02/2020 and Attorney Stevie McDonald is advised that if there is not a competing petition at issue on file by 4/02/2020, the Court may vacate the trial dates.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 03/24/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketRequest - Comment: LETTER TO COURT RE: REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Stipulation and order returned via file & serve

    Read MoreRead Less
80 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Special Administration - Comment: Petition for Letters of Special Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketConfidential Information - Comment: Lori Elizabeth Morelock

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketConfidential Information - Comment: Katrina Lashelle McMillan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of - Comment: Personal Representative Lori Morelock

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of - Comment: Personal Representative Katrina McMillan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative - Comment: Lori Morelock

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative - Comment: Katrina McMillan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration - Comment: Petition for Letters of Administration Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with Full Authority

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Special...returned via AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for Letters...returned via AMS

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.