This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:48:11 (UTC).

RAY KLEIN, INC., DBA PROFESSIONAL CREDIT SERVICE VS ZAPATA

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 RAY KLEIN, INC , DBA PROFESSIONAL CREDIT SERVICE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ZAPATA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5742

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAY KLEIN, INC., DBA PROFESSIONAL CREDIT SERVICE

Defendant

ZAPATA, RAUL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HORSFALL, HANNAH R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Declaration - Comment: RECARDING REDUCED FILING FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less