This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:08:05 (UTC).

RANEY VS DOMUS MANAGEMENT COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 RANEY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DOMUS MANAGEMENT COMPANY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2956

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RANEY, JAMES EDWARD

Defendant

DOMUS MANAGEMENT COMPANY

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Trial

Small Claims Trial 12/21/2017: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketImage of Archived Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-After Court Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Small Claims Trial 12/21/2017: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCertified Mail Claimed - Comment: AS TO DOMUS MANAGEMENT COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Sent to Defendant by Certified Mail - Comment: AS TO DOMUS MANAGEMENT COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Requesting Certified Service of Claim - Comment: AS TO DOMUS MANAGEMENT COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: RANEY, JAMES EDWARD; Served: 10/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: AS TO JAMES EDWARD RANEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: Guide and File - Request for Fee Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: Guide and File - Small Claims Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.