This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/24/2020 at 14:23:17 (UTC).

RANDHAWA VS ZAVALA & ZAVALA

Case Summary

On 12/15/2011 RANDHAWA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ZAVALA ZAVALA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Witt, Gary R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6764

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Witt, Gary R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RANDHAWA, HARJEET K.

Defendants

ZAVALA, HUGO R.

ZAVALA, ANDRIANA Y.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2012
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: RE: DISMISSAL RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2012
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT FILED ~ calid=1789283 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4191, CourtDate:03/15/2012, Courtroom:AL, SessionNumber:2, Sequence:1, SessionType:OSC, Judge:GRW, Deputy:amandaa, SystemDate:12/15/2011 4:37:23 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2012
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Unsatisfied - Comment: COUNTY: KERN ISSUED: 1/23/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2012
  • Docket115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for RANDHAWA, HARJEET K. (PL-1). Received from TRI-STAR EVICTIONS, check no(s) 5103. Receipt #634758 for amount of $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2012
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: COUNTY: KERN ISSUED: 1/23/2012 BY: A.ABRICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2012
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2012
  • DocketJudgment After Hrg Signed by Judge and Entered - Comment: SIGNED BY: JUDGE GARY R. WITT DATE: 1/19/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2012
  • DocketRejection/Correction Form - Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION NOT FILED, MISSING REQUIRED FORM UD-110

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • DocketNP1500 - Comment: Department: AL Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. ELECTRONIC RECORDING NUMBER(S):011212/1448. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: HARJEET K. RANDHAWA (PL-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. HUGO R. ZAVALA (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. ANDRIANA Y. ZAVALA (DE-2) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. PLAINTIFF IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. DEFENDANT-1 DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES ON OWN BEHALF. DEFENDANT-2 DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES ON OWN BEHALF. EVIDENCE SUBMITTED TO THE COURT FOR RULING. JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF, AGAINST DEFENDANTS, RENT/RENTAL DAMAGES $1,200, COSTS $300, ATTORNEY FEES $0, MISC FEES $0 FOR A TOTAL OF $1,500. WRIT OF POSSESSION WILL ISSUE IMMEDIATELY, BUT THERE SHALL BE NO LOCKOUT BEFORE 8:00AM ON 01/27/2012. PLAINTIFF TO PREPARE JUDGMENT FOR SIGNATURE. DISPOSED AFTER COURT TRIAL, AFTER EVIDENCE BY BOTH SIDES (STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • Docket4151 Unlawful Detainer Trial - (N6a) - Comment: Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: ANSWER FILED BY: HUGO R ZAVALA & ANDRIANA Y ZAVALA DATE: 12/22/11

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2011
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: FILED BY: HUGO R. ZAVALA DATE: 12/22/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2011
  • DocketAnswer - Comment: FILED BY: HUGO R. ZAVALA & ANDRIANA Y. ZAVALA DATE: 12/22/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2011
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: WHAT SERVED: ANSWER-UNLAWFUL DETAINER WHO SERVED: HARJEET K. RANDHAWA HOW SERVED: BY MAIL DATE SERVED: 12/22/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2011
  • DocketComplaint/Unlawful Detainer Action Based on CCP 1161A - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2011
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.15.1(c) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.17.1(C) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON Mar 15, 2012 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an answer or other responsive pleading, an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for entry of default, a request for dismissal, a stipulated judgment or stipulation for entry of judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ GARY R WITT Judge of the Superior Court Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.17.1(C) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON Mar 15, 2012 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an answer or other responsive pleading, an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for entry of default, a request for dismissal, a stipulated judgment or stipulation for entry of judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ GARY R WITT Judge of the Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2011
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action - Comment: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. ______________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 629 MAIN STREET, DELANO, CA 93215. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. ______________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 629 MAIN STREET, DELANO, CA 93215.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2011
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2011
  • DocketPrejudgment Claim of Right to Possession - Comment: DATED: 12/15/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2011
  • Docket841J Pmt: Unlawful Detainer Fee <$10,000 GC 70613(B); - Comment: Amount of $240.00 for RANDHAWA, HARJEET K. (PL-1). Received from TRI-STAR EVICTIONS, check no(s) 5086. Receipt #627837 for amount of $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2011
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 431

    Read MoreRead Less