This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 06/04/2020 at 10:34:38 (UTC).

RAMOS VS DUSSARTD

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 RAMOS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DUSSARTD. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foley, Therese M., Bittleston, Dawn and Cervantes, Gina. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1034

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foley, Therese M.

Bittleston, Dawn

Cervantes, Gina

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RAMOS, OMAR

Respondent

DUSSARTD, LINDA

 

Court Documents

Hearing on Waiver of Fees

Hearing on Waiver of Fees 01/17/2020: Judicial Officer: Cervantes, Gina; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW FEES: $435.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Denied / Payment - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Comment: Arrangement TOTAL FEES DUE: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketRevenue Recovery Document-Agreement to Satisfy Court - Comment: Ordered Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing on Waiver of Fees - Hearing on Waiver of Fees 01/17/2020: Judicial Officer: Cervantes, Gina; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW FEES: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketRevenue Recovery Financial Evaluation Recommendation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Hearing Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.