This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 09/09/2021 at 14:56:44 (UTC).

RAMIREZ VS WONDERFUL ORCHARDS, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/01/2020 RAMIREZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against WONDERFUL ORCHARDS, LLC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S. and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2050

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S.

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMIREZ, ANA E.

Defendants

PARAMOUNT CITRUS

WONDERFUL ORCHARDS, LLC

CAL AG RESOURCES, INC.

WONDERFUL CITRUS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOSS, ARI E

Defendant Attorneys

DAVIS, REID P

MEHRTEN, SETH G.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 08/31/2021: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Comment: continued from 08/31/2021 - mediation set for March 2022

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 03/01/2021: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Comment: continued from 03/01/2021

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 12/16/20 Hearing Time: 8:30 Hearing Department/Division: 17

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference 08/31/2021: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Comment: continued from 08/31/2021 - mediation set for March 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 7/22/21 Defendant, WONDERFUL ORCHARDS LLC Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketNotice of Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference 03/01/2021: Case Management Conference 04/30/2021: Case Management Conference 08/31/2021: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued from 04/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketStatement - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketAppendix - Comment: of Evidence in support of Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketSeparate Statement of Undisputed Facts - Comment: in support of Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Motion - Comment: Re: Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing Date: 1/14/22 Hearing Time: 8:30 a.m. Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference 03/01/2021: Case Management Conference 04/30/2021: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued from 03/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Answer to Complaint - $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: Proof of Service - Cal Ag Resources

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: Proof of Service - Paramount Citrus

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: Proof of Service - Wonderful Orchards

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/16/2020; Served: 10/15/2020; Served: 10/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 12/16/20 Hearing Time: 8:30 Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WONDERFUL CITRUS LLC f/k/a PARAMOUNT CITRUS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WONDERFUL ORCHARDS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOSS ARI E.