Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:15:16 (UTC).

RAMIREZ VS SANCHEZ

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 RAMIREZ filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SANCHEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0948

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMIREZ, SAMUEL

Defendants

TOLEDO, GILBERT

SANCHEZ, SARA V

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KUMMER, DIXON G

 

Court Documents

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court)

9/30/15 Minute Order - Unlawful Detainer Trial: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Judgment; Comment: Answer filed by Sara V Sanchez and Gilbert Toledo. Time estimate 30 minutes.; Parties Present Plaintiff: RAMIREZ, SAMUEL

Demurrer

Minute Order-Demurrer to complaint; filed by defendants 8/26/15: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: to Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Court Finding After Court Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: RAMIREZ, SAMUEL; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 810 Castaic Ave Bakersfield, CA 93308; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; The Lease Is Forfeited; Other: Cost awarded per memo of cost; Awarded Against: SANCHEZ, SARA V; TOLEDO, GILBERT; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $2,713.00; Holdover Damages: $3,017.56; Total: $5,730.56

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Writ of Execution Issued - Comment: Money/Kern/South Valley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • Writ Returned and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • Writ of Execution Issued - Comment: Money/Kern/Returned via South Valley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Returned via South Valley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied - Comment: as to Sara V Sanchez; Gilbert Toledo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • Substitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: In Pro Per New Attorney: Dixon G Kummer Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Held in pro per bin "S"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • Writ of Possession Issued - Comment: Returned via South Valley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • Judgment after Trial - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2015
  • Notice of Hearing/Demurrer - Comment: Filed but not calendared. Date noticed is a Friday. Motions heard in D-12 Monday through Thursday. Correction sent via mail.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: RAMIREZ, SAMUEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Address and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 810 CASTAIC AVE BAKERSFIELD, CA 93308

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less