This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:52:42 (UTC).

RAMIREZ VS RAMIREZ (E)

Case Summary

On 10/21/2016 RAMIREZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RAMIREZ E. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Loo, Cynthia L. and McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4625

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Loo, Cynthia L.

McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RAMIREZ, ELIZABETH FAYE

Respondent

RAMIREZ, JOAQUIN JAKES

 

Court Documents

Request for Order - Petitioner

1/17/17 - MO - REQUEST FOR ORDER PETITIONER: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET C/C C/V 3 MINORS; Parties Present Petitioner: RAMIREZ, ELIZABETH FAYE; Respondent: RAMIREZ, JOAQUIN JAKES

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Judgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Comment: STATUS ENDS 5/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Proof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • DCSS: (Default)Judgment re Parental Obligations-Supplemental - Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Comment: 1ST SUPPLEMENTAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Declaration for Default - Comment: DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Request to Enter Default - Comment: DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Findings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Comment: HRG. 01/17/17

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2017
  • Proof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • Proof of Service - Supplemental Summons / Complaint - Comment: FILED BY DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • Declaration For Amended Proposed Judgment (FL-616) - Comment: 1ST SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • Request for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: HRG 1/17/17 DIV E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Summons & Supplemental Complaint (DCSS) - Comment: 1ST FILED BY DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less