Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 18:59:37 (UTC).

RAMIREZ VS AGUILERA

Case Summary

On 07/07/2015 RAMIREZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AGUILERA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P. and Brumfield, Lorna H.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0444

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Brumfield, Lorna H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMIREZ, CLAUDIA

Defendant

AGUILERA, AMADOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AZIZI, DAVID

Defendant Attorneys

KANG, JOSEPH

HILL, GEOFFREY T

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Minute Order - OSC re Dismissal - 11/30/15: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Dismissal of action for non-compliance with CRC rule 3.110b&e. (Cont'd from 10/28/2015)

Case Management Conference

Minute Order-Case Management Conference - 1/11/16: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Minute Order -OSC 3.110b - 10/28/15: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2016
  • Jury Trial - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: T/E 5 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • Final Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: JURY TRIAL 08/08/16; T/E 5 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: T/E 5 DAYS FCMC 8/8/16 TD 8/8/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • Miscellaneous Filing - Comment: Case Consolidated 7-7-16 *DO NOT MAKE ANY ENTRIES*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • Substitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: Joseph Kang, Esq. New Attorney: Geoffrey T. Hill, Esq.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: through Odyssey File & Serve Envelope #95948 Document: Defendant's Notice of Association Reason for Rejection: Association must have signatures of both the lead attorney and the attorney being associated into the case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • Notice of Change Name/Address - Comment: Change of Firm name to Cortez Treneer & Associates

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • Notice of Related Case(s) - Comment: Case number BCV-15-100273

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Jury fees to be posted pursuant to CCP 631 by - Comment: Failure to post will result in an automatic waiver of jury trial.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2015
  • Jury Non-refundable fee pursuant to CCP 631 paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Minute Order - OSC re Dismissal - 11/30/15: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Dismissal of action for non-compliance with CRC rule 3.110b&e. (Cont'd from 10/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Amador Aguilera personal service 11/20/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • Declaration - Comment: of David Azizi re Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Minute Order -OSC 3.110b - 10/28/15: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/28/2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 A.M. Hearing Department/Division: 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less