Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:11:02 (UTC).

RAMIREZ ET AL VS HOOVER TREATED WOOD PRODUCTS, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 RAMIREZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HOOVER TREATED WOOD PRODUCTS, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2289

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AGUIRRE, PATRICIA

RAMIREZ, OFILIA

RAMIREZ, SYLVIA ANN

THE ESTATE OF ROBERT RAMIREZ, SR., BY ITS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST, OFILIA RAMIREZ

RAMIREZ, ROBERT, Jr.

Defendant

HOOVER TREATED WOOD PRODUCTS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLARK, MATTHEW C

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketNotice of Removal of Action - Comment: Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO HOOVER TREATED WOOD, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/16/2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less