This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 21:53:53 (UTC).

RALPH WAYNE COLDEWEY DECEASED

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 RALPH WAYNE COLDEWEY DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R., Wyatt, Ralph W. and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2199

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Wyatt, Ralph W.

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BREWSTER, TIFFANY L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BOYLE, STEPHEN H

 

Court Documents

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 01/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES- 1. Petitioner indicates there was a partial #3 I&A filed, however, no partial #3 was on file only partial #1, #2 & final. 2. Cost advance to attorney in paragraph 19 should be $2,352.67. 3. Need further allegation per PC 9202(b) re an heir or beneficiary having previously been confined.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: BOYLE, STEPHEN H

Hearing on Status Report PC 12200

7/20/17 MO: Hearing on Status Report PC 12200: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: BOYLE, STEPHEN H

Petition for Probate of Will

Probate of will 082715: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTES- 1. Will is not self-proving. Need proof of Subscribing Witness form. 2. Attachment # 8 is incomplete. Need decedent's parents name & date of death. 3. Petitioner's name in # 2 does not match signature ( full name vs. initials). How does petitioner request to be appointed. Need clarification by way of verified supplement.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: BOYLE, STEPHEN H

Hearing on Status Report PC 12200

Hearing on Status Report PC 12200 01/26/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: BOYLE, STEPHEN H

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2018
  • Order - Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Comment: Order on first and final account and report of executor and petition for ordinary commissions to the executor, for ordinary fees to the attorney, and for final distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting - Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 01/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES- 1. Petitioner indicates there was a partial #3 I&A filed, however, no partial #3 was on file only partial #1, #2 & final. 2. Cost advance to attorney in paragraph 19 should be $2,352.67. 3. Need further allegation per PC 9202(b) re an heir or beneficiary having previously been confined.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: BOYLE, STEPHEN H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Supplement - Comment: First supplement to first and final account and report of executor and petition for ordinary commissions to the executor, for ordinary fees to the attorney, and for final distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • Receipt - Comment: Acknowledgment of receipt of preliminary distribution of personal property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • Hearing on Status Report PC 12200 - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Notice of Hearing - Comment: 01/10/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Final Account and Report and Petition for Distribution - Comment: First and final account and report of executor and petition for ordinary commissions to the executor, for ordinary fees to the attorney, and for final distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Inventory and Appraisal - Comment: Final $662,562.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Inventory and Appraisal - Comment: Partial No 2, $1,721,030.36

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Inventory and Appraisal - Comment: Partial No 1, $284,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate of Will - Probate of will 082715: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTES- 1. Will is not self-proving. Need proof of Subscribing Witness form. 2. Attachment # 8 is incomplete. Need decedent's parents name & date of death. 3. Petitioner's name in # 2 does not match signature ( full name vs. initials). How does petitioner request to be appointed. Need clarification by way of verified supplement.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: BOYLE, STEPHEN H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • Supplement - Comment: First Supplement to Petition for Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • Proof of Subscribing Witness

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • Proof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate - Comment: 8/27/2015 @ 9:00am in Div. P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • Last Will & Testament Received/Lodged - Comment: BRW-15-001053 6/19/15 Six (6) pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • Confidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of - Comment: Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative - Comment: Duties and Liabilities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • Petition for Probate - Comment: Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with Full Authority

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Petition for Probate...returned via AMS

    Read MoreRead Less