This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 21:52:46 (UTC).

RAHMAN VS ELIA

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 RAHMAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ELIA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1275

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAHMAN, KHAN

Defendant

ELIA, REVA

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Trial

Minute Order- Small Claims Trial 10/29/15: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: RAHMAN, KHAN

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment Uncontested (CS); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: RAHMAN, KHAN; Judgment Amount: $1,250.00; Awarded Against: ELIA, REVA; Comment: plus court cost to be determined by the clerk.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • Mail Returned Undelivered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • Mail Returned Undelivered - Comment: SENT TO FORWARDING ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • Authorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: KHAN RAMMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Trial - Minute Order- Small Claims Trial 10/29/15: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: RAHMAN, KHAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • Small Claims Trial - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • Mail Returned Undelivered - Comment: RULING TRIAL CONTINUED RETURNED FOR PLAINTIFF, NO RETURN ADDRESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: PERSONAL SRV TO REVA ELIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • Ruling - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: RAHMAN, KHAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: VIA R BIN

    Read MoreRead Less